Swartz v. Trump
Plaintiff: Tiffany Michelle Swartz
Defendant: Donald Trump
Case Number: 3:2019cv00108
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Matthew McCrary Scoble
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 JUDGMENT THAT Complaint re 1 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF DISMISSAL Complaint re #1 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis re #3 is DENIED; all other motions or notices are DENIED. See Order for details. Clerk of Court to enter Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Matthew McCrary Scoble on 6/28/2019. (JBO, CHAMBERS STAFF)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to Tiffany Michelle Swartz re #9 . (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to Tiffany Michelle Swartz re #8 , #7 . (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to Tiffany Michelle Swartz re #6 , #5 . (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to Tiffany Michelle Swartz re #3 , #2 , #1 . (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to Tiffany Michelle Swartz re #4 . (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to the Court by Tiffany Michelle Swartz (Attachments: #1 1)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to the Court by Tiffany Michelle Swartz (Attachments: #1 1)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to the Court by Tiffany Michelle Swartz (Attachments: #1 1)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to the Court by Tiffany Michelle Swartz (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to the Court by Tiffany Michelle Swartz (Attachments: #1 1)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/24/2019) (PXS, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/24/2019) (PXS, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to the Court by Tiffany Michelle Swartz (Attachments: #1 1)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 15, 2019 Notice of Assignment to a US Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent form. Please Note: Forms must NOT be electronically filed with the Court. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 5/6/2019. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tiffany Michelle Swartz.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donald Trump, filed by Tiffany Michelle Swartz. (Attachments: #1 1 Prescription, #2 2, #3 3 Hospital Visit, #4 4)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swartz v. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Michelle Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?