State of Alaska, Department of Commerce, Community and Economic Development, Division of Economic Development v. NIGHT STALKER (Official No. 621111) et al
Plaintiff: State of Alaska, Department of Commerce, Community and Economic Development, Division of Economic Development
Defendant: Andrew C. Bacom and NIGHT STALKER (Official No. 621111)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00117
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Referring Judge: Deborah M Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Alaska, Department of Commerce, Community and Economic Development, Division of Economic Development. Andrew C. Bacom served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Gustafson, Glenn)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appoint Substitute Custodian. Ms. Corrine Osborne is appointed as substitute custodian of NIGHT STALKER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 5/17/2019. (JBO, CHAMBERS STAFF)
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED AFFIDAVIT by State of Alaska, Department of Commerce, Community and Economic Development, Division of Economic Development. Amendment to #6 Affidavit of Substitute Custodian. (Gustafson, Glenn) Modified on 5/15/2019 to clarify text (CME, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Amended Affidavit of Substitute Custodian by State of Alaska, Department of Commerce, Community and Economic Development, Division of Economic Development (Gustafson, Glenn)
May 10, 2019 IN REM WARRANT of Arrest issued as to NIGHT STALKER (Official No.621111). cc: Orig + 1 cert copy to USM. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 DMS TEXT ORDER as to State of Alaska re #6 Affidavit of Substitute Custodian. The affidavit signed by Corrine Osborne opens with the sworn statement of Jeff Duvernay. Plaintiff is directed to submit an amended affidavit correcting this error. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem of Vessel Night Stalker. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 5/9/2019. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 SLG TEXT ORDER: The above referenced case is referred to Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Smith for disposition or findings and recommendations as appropriate pursuant to D.Ak.LMR 4(6): Matters relating to the arrest, seizure or release of vessels and other property under the Supplemental Rules for Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims. (CME, COURT STAFF)
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn M. Gustafson on behalf of State of Alaska, Department of Commerce, Community and Economic Development, Division of Economic Development (Gustafson, Glenn)
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of re #7 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by State of Alaska, Department of Commerce, Community and Economic Development, Division of Economic Development. (Gustafson, Glenn)
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by State of Alaska, Department of Commerce, Community and Economic Development, Division of Economic Development. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement IN REM Warrant for Arrest of Vessel, #3 Supplement Notice of Action and Arrest, #4 Supplement Process Receipt and Return)(Gustafson, Glenn)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Substitute Custodian re #5 MOTION to Appoint Custodian by State of Alaska, Department of Commerce, Community and Economic Development, Division of Economic Development. (Gustafson, Glenn)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Custodian by State of Alaska, Department of Commerce, Community and Economic Development, Division of Economic Development. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gustafson, Glenn)
April 19, 2019 Summons Issued as to Andrew C. Bacom. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Andrew C. Bacom. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing by State of Alaska, Department of Commerce, Community and Economic Development, Division of Economic Development (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE against Andrew C. Bacom, NIGHT STALKER (Official No. 621111) (Filing fee $400/Receipt #ANC015672.), filed by State of Alaska, Department of Commerce, Community and Economic Development, Division of Economic Development. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Alaska, Department of Commerce, Community and Economic Development, Division of Economic Development v. NIGHT STALKER (Official No. 621111) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alaska, Department of Commerce, Community and Economic Development, Division of Economic Development
Represented By: Glenn M. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew C. Bacom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIGHT STALKER (Official No. 621111)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?