Northrim Bank v. EYE OF THE STORM, Official Number 1198962 et al
Plaintiff: Northrim Bank
Defendant: EYE OF THE STORM, Official Number 1198962, Prince William Sound Eco-Charter LLC and David Goldstein
Case Number: 3:2019cv00129
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Referring Judge: Deborah M Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 IN REM WARRANT of Arrest issued as to EYE OF THE STORM, official number 1198962. Orig +1 cert copy to USM. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appoint Custodian. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 5/14/2019. (JJD, COURT STAFF)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 05/14/2019. (JJD, COURT STAFF)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE re Praecipe by Northrim Bank re #5 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem (Manning, Mark)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Ronald D. Graham re #6 MOTION to Appoint Custodian by Northrim Bank. (Manning, Mark)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM Supporting Motion to Appoint Substitute Custodian by Northrim Bank #6 MOTION to Appoint Custodian filed by Northrim Bank, #5 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem filed by Northrim Bank. (Manning, Mark)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Custodian by Northrim Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Appointing Subsitute Custodian)(Manning, Mark)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Northrim Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Authorizing Issuance of Arrest Warrant, #2 Exhibit Proposed Warrant)(Manning, Mark)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The above-referenced case is referred to Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Smith for disposition or findings and recommendations as appropriate pursuant to D.Ak.LMR 4(5) Preferred ship mortgage foreclosures. (CME, COURT STAFF)
May 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to EYE OF THE STORM, Official Number 1198962, David Goldstein, Prince William Sound Eco-Charter LLC. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant EYE OF THE STORM, Official Number 1198962, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Prince William Sound Eco-Charter LLC, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant David Goldstein)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN REM AND IN PERSONAM against EYE OF THE STORM, Official Number 1198962, David Goldstein, Prince William Sound Eco-Charter LLC (Filing fee $400/receipt #ANC015720), filed by Northrim Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Loan Application, #2 Exhibit 2 Business Loan Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 Promissory Note, #4 Exhibit 4 Preferred Marine Mortgage)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northrim Bank v. EYE OF THE STORM, Official Number 1198962 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EYE OF THE STORM, Official Number 1198962
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prince William Sound Eco-Charter LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northrim Bank
Represented By: Mark C. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?