Doe et al v. University of Alaska Board of Regents et al

Plaintiff: Jane Doe, I, Jane Doe, II, Jane Doe, V, Jane Doe, IV and Jane Doe, III
Defendant: David Yesner, University of Alaska Board of Regents and University of Alaska System
Case Number: 3:2019cv00136
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Preclude Use of "Jane Doe" Pseudonyms filed by Jane Doe, II, Jane Doe, I, Jane Doe, III, Jane Doe, V, Jane Doe, IV. (Brandfield-Harvey, Cornelia)
July 9, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE re #15 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles Alfred Sturm, at docket #15 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 2, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jane Doe, II, Jane Doe, I, Jane Doe, III, Jane Doe, V, Jane Doe, IV. (Brandfield-Harvey, Cornelia)
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Preclude Use of "Jane Doe" Pseudonyms by David Yesner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walker, Stacy)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Joint Motion to Extend Scheduling and Planning Conference Report Deadline. The deadline for plaintiff's to file a scheduling and planning report is three weeks after the court rules on the motions to dismiss. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Partial Joinder by David Yesner re #13 MOTION to Dismiss (Walker, Stacy)
June 25, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Counsel to Accompany re #16 MOTION to Dismiss by David Yesner. (Walker, Stacy)
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by David Yesner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walker, Stacy)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Charles A. Sturm. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2719363.) by Jane Doe, II, Jane Doe, I, Jane Doe, III, Jane Doe, V, Jane Doe, IV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Brandfield-Harvey, Cornelia)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File SCHEDULING AND PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT by University of Alaska Board of Regents, University of Alaska System. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ryman, Danielle)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by University of Alaska Board of Regents, University of Alaska System.(Ryman, Danielle)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 6/26/2019. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Non-Opposed) re #1 Complaint by David Yesner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Walker, Stacy) Modified on 6/11/2019 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order Re Motion to Dismiss served on David Yesner on 06/03/2019, filed by Jane Doe, II, Jane Doe, I, Jane Doe, III, Jane Doe, V, Jane Doe, IV. (Brandfield-Harvey, Cornelia)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order Re Motion to Dismiss served on University of Alaska System and University of Alaska Board of Regents on 05/29/2019, filed by Jane Doe, II, Jane Doe, I, Jane Doe, III, Jane Doe, V, Jane Doe, IV. (Brandfield-Harvey, Cornelia)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacy Lee Walker on behalf of David Yesner (Walker, Stacy)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 5/23/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cornelia Brandfield-Harvey, at docket #3 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 15, 2019 Summons Issued as to University of Alaska Board of Regents, University of Alaska System, David Yesner. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant University of Alaska Board of Regents, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant University of Alaska System, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant David Yesner)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Cornelia Brandfield-Harvey. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2700226.) by Jane Doe, II, Jane Doe, I, Jane Doe, III, Jane Doe, V, Jane Doe, IV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Brandfield-Harvey, Cornelia)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Brandfield-Harvey, Cornelia)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2700193.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Brandfield-Harvey, Cornelia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. University of Alaska Board of Regents et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Yesner
Represented By: Stacy Lee Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Alaska Board of Regents
Represented By: Danielle M. Ryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Alaska System
Represented By: Danielle M. Ryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe, I
Represented By: Nicole C. Cusack
Represented By: Cornelia Brandfield-Harvey
Represented By: Charles Alfred Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe, II
Represented By: Nicole C. Cusack
Represented By: Cornelia Brandfield-Harvey
Represented By: Charles Alfred Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe, V
Represented By: Nicole C. Cusack
Represented By: Cornelia Brandfield-Harvey
Represented By: Charles Alfred Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe, IV
Represented By: Nicole C. Cusack
Represented By: Cornelia Brandfield-Harvey
Represented By: Charles Alfred Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe, III
Represented By: Nicole C. Cusack
Represented By: Cornelia Brandfield-Harvey
Represented By: Charles Alfred Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?