Manogamanu v. Nighswonger
Petitioner: Maataua Manogamanu and Maataua Manogiamanu
Respondent: Zane Nighswonger
Case Number: 3:2019cv00140
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Referring Judge: Matthew McCrary Scoble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT. THAT this Petition has been withdrawn per order of the court. This action is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Scott A. Oravec on 5/30/2019. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Scott A. Oravec: Status Conference held 9:35 a.m. to 9:56 a.m. on 5/29/2019. Court and counsel heard re Petitioner's Oral Motion to withdraw Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 ;GRANTED. Court and counsel heard re defendant's detention in other pending matter 3:10-cr-00020-HRH-DMS. APPEARANCES: Defendant Present, In Custody; Christina Sherman, AUSA; T. Burke Wonnell, FPD; Allie J. Abbott, USPO. (ACW, COURT STAFF)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 SAO TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Hearing re #3 is GRANTED. A Status Conference is set for 5/29/2019 at 9:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 6 before Scott A. Oravec. This hearing will be held in conjunction with 3:10-cr-00020-HRH-DMS. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 MMS TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Expedite Consideration. (JBO, CHAMBERS STAFF)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 TMB TEXT ORDER as to Maataua Manogamanu: Pursuant to D.Ak.LMR 2, the motions at document No. #3 and #4 are hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Matthew McCrary Scoble. (RMC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 5/21/2019 to correct reference to MMS.(RMC, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Counsel re #4 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion at Docket 3 by Maataua Manogamanu. (Wonnell, T.)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion at Docket 3 by Maataua Manogamanu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wonnell, T.)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Hearing (Status Conference) by Maataua Manogamanu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wonnell, T.)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Counsel re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Maataua Manogamanu. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus 28:2241, filed by Maataua Manogamanu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manogamanu v. Nighswonger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Zane Nighswonger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maataua Manogamanu
Represented By: T. Burke Wonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maataua Manogiamanu
Represented By: T. Burke Wonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?