Lange v. Professional Account Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Keith James Langer and Keith James Lange
Defendant: Professional Account Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00150
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Professional Account Services, Inc..(Holmes, Roger)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (CME, COURT STAFF)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Professional Account Services, Inc..(Holmes, Roger)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Professional Account Services, Inc.. (Holmes, Roger)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger F. Holmes on behalf of Professional Account Services, Inc. (Holmes, Roger)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keith James Langer. Professional Account Services, Inc. served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Barshay, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Receipt of $150.00 non-resident attorney payment for David Michael Barshay as to plaintiff Keith James Langer. re #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney David M. Barshay (BJK, COURT STAFF)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Barshay, at docket #3 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 3, 2019 Summons Issued as to Professional Account Services, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Professional Account Services, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney David M. Barshay by Keith James Langer.(Cook, William)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (KXC, COURT STAFF)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Professional Account Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 Receipt Number: ANC015786), filed by Keith James Lange.(KXC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/16/2019 to correct the spelling of plf's last name(CME, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lange v. Professional Account Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith James Langer
Represented By: William D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith James Lange
Represented By: William D. Cook
Represented By: David Michael Barshay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Account Services, Inc.
Represented By: Roger F. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?