Ruppert v. Atlas Air Inc et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Ruppert
Defendant: Atlas Air Inc and Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Co
Case Number: 3:2019cv00152
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Co.(Buhite, Russell)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER approving #9 Stipulated Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Hartford shall have until 7/17/19 to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION re: Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Buhite, Russell)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Administrative Record due within 60 days. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 6/24/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal of Atlas LTD Plan by Thomas Ruppert re #1 Complaint, (Flanigan, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell S. Buhite on behalf of All Defendants (Buhite, Russell)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas Ruppert re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Flanigan, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Notice to Counsel. Plaintiff shall either file proofs of service or status report within seven days of the Order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 28, 2019 Summons Issued as to Atlas Air Inc, Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Co. (KXC, COURT STAFF)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Atlas Air, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan; Harford Life Accident Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Atlas)(KXC, COURT STAFF)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (KXC, COURT STAFF)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Atlas Air Inc, Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Co (Filing fee $ 400. Receipt #ANC015790), filed by Thomas Ruppert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(KXC, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruppert v. Atlas Air Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Air Inc
Represented By: Russell S. Buhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Co
Represented By: Russell S. Buhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Ruppert
Represented By: Michael W. Flanigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?