International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 1547, AFL-CIO v. Alaska Communications Systems Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 1547, AFL-CIO
Defendant: Alaska Communications Systems Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00160
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 1547, AFL-CIO #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 1547, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit)(Roberts, Justin)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 1547, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit)(Roberts, Justin)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Roberts, Justin)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by All Plaintiffs.(Roberts, Justin)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re Initial Scheduling & Planning Conference Report. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 7/8/19. (Attachments: #1 Civil Form 26(f)) (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 1547, AFL-CIO by Alaska Communications Systems Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Adlong, Daniel)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re #5 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Albanil Adlong, at docket #5 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Daniel A. Adlong. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2721101.) by Alaska Communications Systems Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Adlong, Daniel)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 1547, AFL-CIO re #1 Complaint, and Summons (Roberts, Justin)
June 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to Alaska Communications Systems Holdings, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Alaska Communications Systems Holdings, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Roberts, Justin)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT To Compel Arbitration against Alaska Communications Systems Holdings, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2710215.), filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 1547, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Roberts, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 1547, AFL-CIO v. Alaska Communications Systems Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 1547, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Justin Weaver Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Communications Systems Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Albanil Adlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?