Hewko et al v. Regence Blueshield et al
Plaintiff: Peter Hewko, Jane Hewko and David Hewko
Defendant: Regence Blueshield and Coffman Engineers, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00169
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of James E. Torgerson re #17 Memorandum, #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Regence Blueshield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Torgerson, James)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM ISO Motion to Dismiss by Regence Blueshield #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Regence Blueshield. (Torgerson, James)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Regence Blueshield.(Torgerson, James)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Brewster H. Jamieson re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Coffman Engineers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Jamieson, Brewster)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Coffman Engineers, Inc..(Jamieson, Brewster)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regence Blueshield. (Torgerson, James)
July 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal Defendants' answer due 8/12/19. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 7/28/19. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Regence Blueshield. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torgerson, James)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Consent of Removal by Regence Blueshield re #1 Notice of Removal (Torgerson, James)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Torgerson on behalf of Regence Blueshield (Torgerson, James)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Coffman Engineers, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Jury Demand, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Peremptory Challenge, #6 Notice of Removal)(Huggler, Hans)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Coffman Engineers, Inc. (Huggler, Hans)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Hans Nicholas Huggler on behalf of Coffman Engineers, Inc. (Huggler, Hans)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brewster H. Jamieson on behalf of Coffman Engineers, Inc. (Jamieson, Brewster)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet. (Jamieson, Brewster)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Hans N. Huggler re #1 Notice of Removal by Coffman Engineers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint)(Jamieson, Brewster)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Coffman Engineers, Inc. from Superior Court for Alaska at Anchorage, case number 3AN-19-07386. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2714814), filed by Coffman Engineers, Inc..(Jamieson, Brewster)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hewko et al v. Regence Blueshield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Hewko
Represented By: Phillip Paul Weidner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Hewko
Represented By: Phillip Paul Weidner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hewko
Represented By: Phillip Paul Weidner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regence Blueshield
Represented By: James E. Torgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coffman Engineers, Inc.
Represented By: Brewster H. Jamieson
Represented By: Hans Nicholas Huggler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?