Aurora Hospitality LLC v. Kim
Plaintiff: Aurora Hospitality LLC
Defendant: Alexander Doo Wook Kim
Case Number: 3:2019cv00173
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the status report at docket #9 and the parties' request for an additional 30 days is GRANTED. The Scheduling Order to be filed by 08/15/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT Updated by Aurora Hospitality LLC. (Pharr, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Alexander Doo Wook Kim (Baylous, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Alexander Doo Wook Kim (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2, #3 Appendix 3, #4 Appendix 4, #5 Appendix 5, #6 Appendix 6, #7 Appendix 7, #8 Appendix 8, #9 Appendix 9, #10 Appendix 10, #11 Appendix 11, #12 Appendix 12, #13 Appendix 13)(Baylous, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT re settlement discussions by Aurora Hospitality LLC. (Pharr, John)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 6/20/19. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling and Planning Conference Report)(RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet. (Baylous, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Michael B. Baylous re #1 Notice of Removal by Alexander Doo Wook Kim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Opposition)(Baylous, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alexander Doo Wook Kim from Superior Court for Anchorage, case number 3AN-19-07471CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2716563), filed by Alexander Doo Wook Kim.(Baylous, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aurora Hospitality LLC v. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurora Hospitality LLC
Represented By: John C. Pharr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Doo Wook Kim
Represented By: Michael Bruce Baylous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?