Kelly et al v. Clear Recon Corp et al
Plaintiff: Lewis Kelly and Ethel Kelly
Defendant: Loan Depot.com, LLC, Clear Recon Corp and Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 3:2019cv00185
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ethel Kelly, Lewis Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beardsley, Jennifer)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 Motion to Dismiss. As agreed, the response is due on or before 8/14/2019; any reply is due on or before 9/9/2019. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/9/2019. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Unopposed by Ethel Kelly, Lewis Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beardsley, Jennifer)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed by Ethel Kelly, Lewis Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beardsley, Jennifer) Modified on 8/7/2019 to create relationship to dkt 4.(RMC, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 Motion to Dismiss. As agreed by the parties, Opposition due on or before 8/5/2019 and reply due on or before 8/26/2019.(NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE re #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Marielise Fraioli, at docket #7 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Unopposed by Ethel Kelly, Lewis Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beardsley, Jennifer)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Federal National Mortgage Association, Loan Depot.com, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Campion, Clinton)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Marielise Fraioli. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2728605.) by Federal National Mortgage Association, Loan Depot.com, LLC.(Fraioli, Marielise)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Notice of Complete Service List by Clinton Matthew Campion on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association, Loan Depot.com, LLC (Campion, Clinton)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 JOINDER TO MOTION to Dismiss by Clear Recon Corp #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Loan Depot.com, LLC. (Stoddard, Lewis)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Federal National Mortgage Association, Loan Depot.com, LLC.(Campion, Clinton)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Loan Depot.com, LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association from Superior Court for the State of Alaska, Third Judicial District of Anchorage, case number 3AN-19-5968 CI. ( Filing fee $400/receipt #ANC015898), filed by Loan Depot.com, LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly et al v. Clear Recon Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Kelly
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Beardsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel Kelly
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Beardsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loan Depot.com, LLC
Represented By: Clinton Matthew Campion
Represented By: Marielise Fraioli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Recon Corp
Represented By: Lewis Nishioka Stoddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Clinton Matthew Campion
Represented By: Marielise Fraioli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?