Kone v. Runnels et al
Plaintiff: Tidiane Kone
Defendant: Julia D. Moudy, Kelly J Jantunen, Kevin Saxby, Katholyn Runnels and Marcell
Case Number: 3:2019cv00191
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Referring Judge: Deborah M Smith
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 9/4/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Complaint, at docket #1 , is DISMISSED without prejudice. All outstanding motions are DENIED. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 9/3/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGE BEISTLINE TEXT ORDER: By agreement of the Judges, this case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Ralph R. Beistline for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:19-cv-00191-RRB. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court will change the Nature of Suit in this case from 470 to 550, to correctly identify the case as a Prisoner's Civil Rights case. This action is administrative in nature only. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
July 10, 2019 Notice of Assignment to a US Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent form. Please Note: Forms must NOT be electronically filed with the Court. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 7/31/2019. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tidiane Kone.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2019: #1 Account Statement) (PXS, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kelly J Jantunen, Marcell, Julia D. Moudy, Katholyn Runnels, Kevin Saxby, filed by Tidiane Kone. (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kone v. Runnels et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia D. Moudy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly J Jantunen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Saxby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katholyn Runnels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tidiane Kone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?