Evans v. USA
Plaintiff: Linda Evans
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00194
Filed: July 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Defendant William Barr on 08/06/2019, filed by Linda Evans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert Mail Return Receipt to W. Barr)(Power, Michele)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint Affidavit of Service to Defendant served on Defendant Bryan Schroder on 08/14/2019, filed by Linda Evans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert Mail Return Receipt)(Power, Michele)
August 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to Bryan Schroder, U.S. Attorney. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Bryan Schroder, U.S. Attorney. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 19, 2019 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney General, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2730448.), filed by Linda Evans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Power, Michele)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Evans
Represented By: Michele L. Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?