Gwich'in Steering Committee et al v. U.S. Department of the Interior et al
Plaintiff: Alaska Wilderness League, The Wilderness Society, Defenders of Wildlife and Gwich'in Steering Committee
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Department of the Interior and U.S. Bureau of Land Management
Case Number: 3:2019cv00208
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Transfer and to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by U.S. Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Dkt 14, #2 Exhibit B- Dkt 15)(Fonstad, John)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Expedite Consideration re 14 Motion to Transfer and to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Response. Reply due 9/27/19. Defendants to notify the court by 9/25/19 if no intention to file a reply. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Expedite (Unopposed) Consideration of Motion to Transfer and to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Partial) filed by U.S. Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Fonstad, John)
September 21, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Maresa Jenson re #17 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Alaska Wilderness League, Defenders of Wildlife, Gwich'in Steering Committee, The Wilderness Society. (Brown, Valerie)
September 21, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Transfer and to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Alaska Wilderness League, Defenders of Wildlife, Gwich'in Steering Committee, The Wilderness Society. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Valerie)
September 21, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Maresa Jenson re #15 MOTION to Expedite (Unopposed) Consideration of Motion to Transfer and to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Alaska Wilderness League, Defenders of Wildlife, Gwich'in Steering Committee, The Wilderness Society. (Brown, Valerie)
September 21, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Expedite (Unopposed) Consideration of Motion to Transfer and to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Alaska Wilderness League, Defenders of Wildlife, Gwich'in Steering Committee, The Wilderness Society. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Valerie)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer and to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by U.S. Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - District of Columbia Live Database, #3 Exhibit C - LexisNexis CourtLink Search, #4 Proposed Order)(Fonstad, John)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alaska Wilderness League, Gwich'in Steering Committee, Defenders of Wildlife, The Wilderness Society. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service served on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Jenson, Maresa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alaska Wilderness League, Gwich'in Steering Committee, Defenders of Wildlife, The Wilderness Society. U.S. Department of the Interior served on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Jenson, Maresa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alaska Wilderness League, Gwich'in Steering Committee, Defenders of Wildlife, The Wilderness Society. U.S. Bureau of Land Management served on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Jenson, Maresa)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE re #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David A. Bahr, at docket #7 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 Amended Civil Cover Sheet. (Jenson, Maresa) Modified on 8/1/2019 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2019 Summons Issued as to U.S. Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Department of the Interior, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Bureau of Land Management, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney David A. Bahr. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2736174.) by Alaska Wilderness League, Defenders of Wildlife, Gwich'in Steering Committee, The Wilderness Society. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Jenson, Maresa)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Wilderness Society. (Jenson, Maresa)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gwich'in Steering Committee. (Jenson, Maresa)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defenders of Wildlife. (Jenson, Maresa)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alaska Wilderness League. (Jenson, Maresa)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Jenson, Maresa)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2736070.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Jenson, Maresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gwich'in Steering Committee et al v. U.S. Department of the Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Wilderness League
Represented By: Valerie L. Brown
Represented By: Maresa Jenson
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Represented By: David A. Bahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Wilderness Society
Represented By: Valerie L. Brown
Represented By: Maresa Jenson
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Represented By: David A. Bahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Valerie L. Brown
Represented By: Maresa Jenson
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Represented By: David A. Bahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwich'in Steering Committee
Represented By: Valerie L. Brown
Represented By: Maresa Jenson
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Represented By: David A. Bahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: John A. Fonstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior
Represented By: John A. Fonstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: John A. Fonstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?