Apling v. Saul
Plaintiff: Casey Lynn Apling
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv00225
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casey Lynn Apling. Andrew M. Saul served on 9/5/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed on Attorney General of USA, DOJ, #2 Summons Executed on Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region X, SSA)(Chermol, David)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather L. Griffith on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Griffith, Heather)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 9/9/19. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Pomeroy on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Pomeroy, Richard)
August 19, 2019 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Unissued summons re Defendant United States Attorney's Office for District of Alaska, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Attorney General for the United States, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Office of the Regional Chief Counsel)(BJK, COURT STAFF)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2745027.), filed by Casey Lynn Apling. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chermol, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apling v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Represented By: Heather L. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Lynn Apling
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?