Thomas v. Scooper Trooper, LLC
Plaintiff: Colin Thomas
Defendant: Scooper Trooper, LLC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00227
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re Notice to Counsel re #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The court will take no further action in this case until the matter of the admission of counsel for plaintiff is resolved. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Liebowitz, Richard)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/13/2019 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scooper Trooper, LLC.. (Tavella, Anne)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defendant's Answer to Complaint by Scooper Trooper, LLC..(Tavella, Anne)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 8/27/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to Scooper Trooper, LLC. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Scooper Trooper, LLC, (BJK, COURT STAFF) Modified on 8/20/2019 to correct name. (BJK, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scooper Trooper, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2745997.), filed by Colin Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liebowitz, Richard) Modified on 8/20/2019 to correct name.(BJK, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Scooper Trooper, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Thomas
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scooper Trooper, LLC.
Represented By: Anne Marie Tavella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?