Spruce Root, Inc. v. SALLY N, Official No. 261250 et al
Plaintiff: Spruce Root, Inc.
Defendant: SALLY N, Official No. 261250, Steven P. Johnson and M/V SALLY N
Case Number: 3:2019cv00232
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Referring Judge: Deborah M Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re Initial Scheduling and Planning Conference Report. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Form)(JJD, COURT STAFF)
October 11, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Steven P. Johnson, M/V SALLY N, SALLY N, Official No. 261250.(Thompson, Leif)
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 DMS TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant Steven Johnson alleges he was out of town and not made aware of the complaint until two days before an answer was due. Defendant also alleges he lives in the small and relatively remote town of Wrangell and had difficulty procuring a lawyer. The Court finds that this constitutes good cause under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b). The defendants Steven P. Johnson, M/V SALLY N, SALLY N. Official Number 261250 shall have an additional 14 days to file an answer to the plaintiff's complaint. The answer must be filed no later than close of business, Monday, October 14, 2019. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Steven P. Johnson, M/V SALLY N, SALLY N, Official No. 261250. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Leif)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Order re Motion for Entry of Default re #8 by Steven P. Johnson, M/V SALLY N, SALLY N, Official No. 261250. (Thompson, Leif) Modified on 9/30/2019 to clarify type of order and link to 8. (BJK, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION FOR RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendants Steven P. Johnson and M/V Sally N Declaration of Steven Johnson filed by Steven P. Johnson, M/V SALLY N, SALLY N, Official No. 261250. (Thompson, Leif) Modified on 9/30/2019 to correct document type. (BJK, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendants Steven P. Johnson and M/V Sally N filed by Steven P. Johnson, M/V SALLY N, SALLY N, Official No. 261250. (Thompson, Leif)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Leif Thompson on behalf of All Defendants (Thompson, Leif)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendants Steven P. Johnson and M/V Sally N by Spruce Root, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Casperson, John)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Spruce Root, Inc.. (Casperson, John)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Exhibits A thru E, and Civil Cover Sheet served on MV SALLY N on August 30, 2019, filed by Spruce Root, Inc.. (Casperson, John)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Exhibits A thru E, and Civil Cover Sheet served on Steven P. Johnson on August 30, 2019, filed by Spruce Root, Inc.. (Casperson, John)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE/ORDER: The above-referenced case is referred to Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Smith for disposition or findings and recommendations as appropriate pursuant to D.Ak.LMR 4:(5) Preferred ship mortgage foreclosures. (CME, COURT STAFF)
August 27, 2019 Summons Issued as to Steven P. Johnson, M/V SALLY N. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Steven P. Johnson, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant M/V Sally N)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Casperson, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Foreclose Preferred Ship Mortgage In Rem, Enforcement of Security Interest, And For Debt against Steven P. Johnson, M/V SALLY N, SALLY N, Official No. 261250 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2749240.), filed by Spruce Root, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Casperson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spruce Root, Inc. v. SALLY N, Official No. 261250 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALLY N, Official No. 261250
Represented By: Leif Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven P. Johnson
Represented By: Leif Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V SALLY N
Represented By: Leif Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spruce Root, Inc.
Represented By: John E. Casperson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?