United State of America v. $7,300.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United State of America
Defendant: $7,300.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2019cv00233
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 WARRANT of ARREST in Rem issued granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Scott A. Oravec on 9/5/19. (LMH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/5/2019 to clarify text (CME, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The above-referenced case is referred to Magistrate Judge Scott A. Oravec for disposition or findings and recommendations as appropriate pursuant to D.Ak.LMR 4:(6) Matters relating to the arrest, seizure or release of vessels and other property under the supplemental Rules for Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims. (CME, COURT STAFF)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United State of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(KMC, COURT STAFF)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (KMC, COURT STAFF)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $7,300.00 in United States Currency (Filing fee $ 0.), filed by United State of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Agent Grow)(KMC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 8/28/2019 to reflect date filed(PXS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United State of America v. $7,300.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United State of America
Represented By: Kelly A. Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $7,300.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?