Nash v. Matanuska Susitna Borough
Plaintiff: Charles E. Nash
Defendant: Matanuska Susitna-Borough
Case Number: 3:2019cv00235
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 16(b) Order)(CME, COURT STAFF)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 Matanuska-Susitna Borough's ANSWER to #1 Complaint of Charles Nash by Matanuska Susitna Borough.(Sears, Trina)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles E. Nash. Matanuska Susitna Borough served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 4, 2019 Summons Issued as to Matanuska Susitna Borough. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Matanuska Susitna Borough. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for a Constitutional Taking against Matanuska Susitna-Borough (Filing fee $400/Receipt #ANC016118), filed by Charles E. Nash.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nash v. Matanuska Susitna Borough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matanuska Susitna-Borough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?