Krauss v. Saul
Plaintiff: Sabrina Krauss
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv00239
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick D. Fripps on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Fripps, Frederick)
September 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sabrina Krauss. Andrew M. Saul served on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Eaglin, Paul)
September 16, 2019 Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket #5 , when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Agency record due within 60 days of the Defendant's entry of appearance. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 9/16/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Pomeroy on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Pomeroy, Richard)
September 5, 2019 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Commissioner of Social Security, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney General, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Eaglin, Paul)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2754297.), filed by Sabrina Krauss.(Eaglin, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krauss v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Krauss
Represented By: Paul B. Eaglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Represented By: Frederick D. Fripps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?