Doleman v. Saul
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Doleman
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv00242
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: agency record due 60 days after appearance; opening brief due 30 days, response brief due 30 days, any reply brief due 14 days. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 10/1/19. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey E. Staples on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Staples, Jeffrey)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Marie Doleman. Andrew M. Saul served on 9/20/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Eaglin, Paul)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Pomeroy on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Pomeroy, Richard)
September 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (RMC, COURT STAFF)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk to issue summons. Defendant shall answer in 60 days. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 9/13/19. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Commissioner of Social Security, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney General, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.s. Attorney)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lisa Marie Doleman.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Lisa Marie Doleman.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doleman v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Doleman
Represented By: Paul B. Eaglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?