Osterkamp v. AARP
Plaintiff: Kenneth Osterkamp
Defendant: AARP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00245
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by AARP.(Saade, Renea)
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 JWS TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Answer is now due November 8, 2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
October 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint - Unopposed by AARP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saade, Renea)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Complaint. Defendant will file its response on or before October 25, 2019. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 10/14/19. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint - Unopposed by AARP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saade, Renea)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE re #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Scott Oswald, at docket #6 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE re #5 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas W. Woodfield, at docket #5 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER: The motions at dockets #8 and #9 are granted. No further response to the order at docket 7 is necessary. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 Receipt of 300 non-resident attorney payment for Nicholas W. Woodfield and Robert Scott Oswald as to Plaintiff Kenneth Osterkamp. re #8 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Application of Non-Eligible Atty for Permission to Appear and Participate in the USDC for Alaska, #9 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Robert Scott Oswald (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Robert Scott Oswald by Kenneth Osterkamp.(Seaver, Timothy)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Application of Non-Eligible Atty for Permission to Appear and Participate in the USDC for Alaska by Kenneth Osterkamp.(Seaver, Timothy)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER: The complaint in this case was filed by Timothy W. Seaver whose office is in Anchorage, Alaska. At docket #5 Nicholas Woodfield has moved to appear pro hac vice without association of local counsel. At docket #6 Robert Scott Oswald has moved to appear pro hac vice without association of local counsel. Mssrs. Seaver, Woodfiled and Oswald are directed to confer and then within 7 days advise the court which of them is to represent plaintiff. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Robert Scott Oswald by Kenneth Osterkamp.(Seaver, Timothy)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Nicholas Woodfield by Kenneth Osterkamp.(Seaver, Timothy)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 9/17/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to AARP. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant AARP. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AARP (Filing fee $400/Receipt #ANC016148.), filed by Kenneth Osterkamp.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osterkamp v. AARP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Osterkamp
Represented By: Timothy W. Seaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?