Klebs v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sarah Klebs
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00251
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven Arthur Pradell (Pradell, Steven)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Rankin, Christina)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Rankin, Christina)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Rankin, Christina)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Rankin, Christina)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Rankin, Christina)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Rankin, Christina)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company from Superior Court, case number 3AN-19-08950CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2758451), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit State court notice of removal)(Rankin, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klebs v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Klebs
Represented By: Brett Von Gemmingen
Represented By: Steven Pradell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christina A. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?