Tanner v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Anastasia Tanner
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00253
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Colbo, Kimberlee)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Kimberlee Colbo re #11 Reply to Response to Motion by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Colbo, Kimberlee)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Sever and Stay "Bad Faith" Claims filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Colbo, Kimberlee)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Sever and Stay "Bad Faith" Claims filed by Anastasia Tanner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Barber, Jeffrey)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Kimberlee A. Colbo re #8 MOTION to Sever and Stay "Bad Faith" Claims by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Colbo, Kimberlee)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Sever and Stay "Bad Faith" Claims by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Proposed Order)(Colbo, Kimberlee)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Barber on behalf of Anastasia Tanner (Barber, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Colbo, Kimberlee)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case Description, #2 Exhibit Motion to Extend Time of Service, #3 Exhibit Order Re: Motion to Extend Time of Service, #4 Exhibit Defendant's Entry of Appearance, #5 Exhibit Defendant's Demand for Jury Trial, #6 Exhibit Counsel of Record)(Colbo, Kimberlee)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Colbo, Kimberlee)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Alaska Superior Court, case number 3AN-19-05962 CI. ( Filing fee $400/Receipt #ANC016168), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons and Notice of Both Parties, #4 Notice of Service of Process, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Notice of Removal of Civil Action)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tanner v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberlee A. Colbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anastasia Tanner
Represented By: Benjamin Richard Crittenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?