Lambe et al v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael James Lambe and Marilyn Plitnik
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. and Zimmer, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00254
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Case transferred to Southern District of New York. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-18) - 1 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in AK/3:19-cv-00254, 139 in MDL No. 2859) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. This case is transferred to the Southern District of New York for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Stay Proceedings and Answer Deadline Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation. All proceedings will be stayed. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Answer Deadline Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Baxter, Lee)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Colin Baxter on behalf of All Defendants (Baxter, Lee)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Complaint against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc., filed by Michael James Lambe, Marilyn Plitnik.(Sandberg, Peter)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Defendants on 10-1-19, filed by Michael James Lambe, Marilyn Plitnik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sandberg, Peter)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 10/1/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Zimmer, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Zimmer U.S., Inc)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. (Filing fee $400/Receipt #ANC016170.), filed by Michael James Lambe, Marilyn Plitnik.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lambe et al v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James Lambe
Represented By: Peter A. Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Plitnik
Represented By: Peter A. Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?