State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. AAA Moving & Storage, Inc.
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: AAA Moving & Storage, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00261
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 10/30/19. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Ertz, Ralph)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by AAA Moving & Storage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Affidavit of Service, #4 Notice of Removal, #5 Amended Notice of Removal)(Huggler, Hans)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by AAA Moving & Storage, Inc. (Huggler, Hans)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE re #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James A. Wescoe, at docket #7 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney James A. Wescoe. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2771372.) by AAA Moving & Storage, Inc..(Wescoe, James)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AAA Moving & Storage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Order)(Huggler, Hans)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Hans N. Huggler re #1 Notice of Removal, by AAA Moving & Storage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Docket)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AAA Moving & Storage, Inc. from District Court for the State of Alaska, Third Judicial District at Anchorage, case number 3AN-19-09290 CI. ( Filing fee $400/Receipt #ANC016193), filed by AAA Moving & Storage, Inc.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. AAA Moving & Storage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Ralph V. Ertz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAA Moving & Storage, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Bruce Baylous
Represented By: Hans Nicholas Huggler
Represented By: James A. Wescoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?