Trout Unlimited v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Plaintiff: Trout Unlimited
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Matthew Z. Leopold, Chris Hladick and Andrew Wheeler
Case Number: 3:2019cv00268
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Referring Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE: granting #12 Motion to Consolidate Cases. All further filings shall be made in Case No. 3:19-cv-00265-SLG, and the case caption for these consolidated cases is amended as set forth above. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/22/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
October 16, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE re #9 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rachelle Plotkin Bishop, at docket #9 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (CME, COURT STAFF)
October 16, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE re #8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abraham J. Shanedling, at docket #8 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (CME, COURT STAFF)
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE re #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven P. Hollman, at docket #7 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (CME, COURT STAFF)
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE re #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul A. Werner, at docket #6 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (CME, COURT STAFF)
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 TMB TEXT ORDER: Chief Judge Timothy M. Burgess hereby recuses himself from the above-referenced case. By agreement of the judges, the above referenced case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Sharon L. Gleason for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:19-cv-00268-SLG. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Trout Unlimited.(Williams, Austin)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Response to Notice of Related Cases DKT 5 by Chris Hladick, Matthew Z. Leopold, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler re #5 Notice (Other) (Pomeroy, Richard)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER: The assigned judge hereby recuses. This case is re-assigned by random draw to Hon. Timothy M. Burgess. The case number henceforth will be 3:19-00268-TMB. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Rachelle Plotkin Bishop. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2770227.) by Trout Unlimited.(Bishop, Rachelle)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Abraham J. Shanedling. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2770221.) by Trout Unlimited.(Shanedling, Abraham)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Steven P. Hollman. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2770213.) by Trout Unlimited.(Hollman, Steven)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Paul A. Werner. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2770202.) by Trout Unlimited.(Werner, Paul)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case by Trout Unlimited (Williams, Austin)
October 9, 2019 Summons Issued as to Chris Hladick, Matthew Z. Leopold, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, (Attachments: #1 Andrew Wheeler, #2 Chris Hladick, #3 Matthew Z. Leopold, #4 U.S. Attorney General, #5 U.S. Attorney)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trout Unlimited. (Williams, Austin)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2769923.), filed by Trout Unlimited. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B (Part 1 of 4), #4 Exhibit B (Part 2 of 4), #5 Exhibit B (Part 3 of 4), #6 Exhibit B (Part 4 of 4))(Williams, Austin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trout Unlimited v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Z. Leopold
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Hladick
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trout Unlimited
Represented By: Abraham J. Shanedling
Represented By: Paul Werner
Represented By: Rachelle Bishop
Represented By: Steven P. Hollman
Represented By: Austin E. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?