Miller et al v. LoanCare, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth H. Miller and Neena M. Miller
Defendant: LoanCare, LLC and Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00274
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand filed by Kenneth H. Miller, Neena M. Miller. (Beardsley, Jennifer)
December 10, 2019 Filing 18 TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING #17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Plaintiffs' Reply is now due on or before 12/13/2019.(NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
December 6, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Response in Opposition to Motion Unopposed by Kenneth H. Miller, Neena M. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beardsley, Jennifer)
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #11 Motion to Remand. By agreement of the parties, Plaintiffs shall file their Reply to Defendants Opposition to PlaintiffsMotion to Remand on or before December 9, 2019. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed by Kenneth H. Miller, Neena M. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beardsley, Jennifer) Modified on 12/9/2019 to create relationship to dkt 11. (RMC, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, LoanCare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Trustee's Deed, #2 Proposed Order)(Seville, Michael)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) by Kenneth H. Miller, Neena M. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beardsley, Jennifer)
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for Remand by Kenneth H. Miller, Neena M. Miller #11 MOTION to Remand filed by Neena M. Miller, Kenneth H. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Beardsley, Jennifer)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Kenneth H. Miller, Neena M. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beardsley, Jennifer)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state court documents)(Seville, Michael)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Compliance (Service List) by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, LoanCare, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service List)(Seville, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, LoanCare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note)(Seville, Michael)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing with State Court by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, LoanCare, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice to Plaintiffs and Clerk of The Superior Court for the State of Alaska at Anchorage of Removal of Civil Action to the U.S. District Court for the District of Alaska)(Seville, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LoanCare, LLC. (Seville, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Seville, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Seville on behalf of All Defendants (Seville, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LoanCare, LLC, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC from Alaska Superior Court, case number 3AN-19-9952 CI. (Filing fee $400/receipt #ANC016258), filed by LoanCare, LLC, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Deed of Trust)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. LoanCare, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth H. Miller
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Beardsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neena M. Miller
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Beardsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LoanCare, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Seville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Seville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?