Granger v. Kitiona et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Granger
Defendant: Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Regina Kitiona
Case Number: 3:2019cv00289
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT case is remanded to Superior Court. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 12/20/19. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING #6 Joint Motion to Remand to State Court. It is HEREBY ORDERED that this case be remanded to the Superior Court for the State of Alaska at Anchorage. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Court on Request for Remand to State Court by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Cheryl) Modified on 12/9/2019 to correct event.(RMC, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to Regina Kitiona re #2 , #4 , #3 , #1 . (PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Graves, Cheryl)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company from Superior Court for the State of Alaska, case number 3AN-19-08000 CI. (Filing fee $400/receipt #ANC016340), filed by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State Notice of Removal)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granger v. Kitiona et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Cheryl L. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Kitiona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Granger
Represented By: Robert D. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?