Reynolds v. Pender Capital Asset Based Lending Fund, I, LP
Plaintiff: Janice Reynolds
Defendant: Pender Capital Asset Based Lending Fund I, LP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00300
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Referring Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re Case Dismissed: This case is dismissed with prejudice, the parties to bear their respective costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 12/17/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 12, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pender Capital Asset Based Lending Fund I, LP. (Pallesen, Bryn)
December 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Pender Capital Asset Based Lending Fund I, LP (Attachments: #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Damages Part 1 of 2, #2 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Damages Part 2 of 2, #3 Case Description Form, #4 Summons and Notice to Both Parties of Judicial Assignment, #5 Entry of Appearance (Bryn R. Pallesen), #6 Notice of Filing of a Notice of Removal)(Pallesen, Bryn)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Stay re #7 Initial Case Status Report Order (Joint Stipulation Staying Scheduling and Discovery Deadlines) by Pender Capital Asset Based Lending Fund I, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pallesen, Bryn)
December 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Janice Reynolds (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit State Court Documents, #4 Exhibit State Court Documents, #5 Exhibit State Court Documents, #6 Exhibit State Court Documents)(Ainsworth, Breeman)
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 Plaintiff's Service List of All Parties by Janice Reynolds.(Ainsworth, Breeman) Modified on 12/3/2019 to terminate motion event and clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Garland "Land" Murphy re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Pender Capital Asset Based Lending Fund I, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Quitclaim Deed, #2 Exhibit 2 Foreclosure Order, #3 Exhibit 3 2019.09.05 Billinger Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 2015.10.30 Final Judgment, #5 Exhibit 5 Ainsworth Email, #6 Exhibit 6 April 2019 Contempt Order, #7 Exhibit 7 August 2019 Contempt Order, #8 Exhibit 8 Bench Warrant, #9 Exhibit 9 November 2019 Contempt Order, #10 Exhibit 10 Quitclaim Deed, #11 Exhibit 11 Release)(Pallesen, Bryn)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Pender Capital Asset Based Lending Fund I, LP.(Pallesen, Bryn)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Pender Capital Asset Based Lending Fund I, LP (Pallesen, Bryn)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 JWS TEXT ORDER: The assigned judge recuses from presiding in this case. This case is re-assigned by random draw to Hon. H. Russel Holland for all further proceedings. Henceforth, parties to use the following case caption for all future filings in 3:19-cv-300-HRH. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryn Resser Pallesen on behalf of Pender Capital Asset Based Lending Fund, I, LP (Pallesen, Bryn)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet. (Pallesen, Bryn)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Bryn R. Pallesen ISO Defendant's Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, by Pender Capital Asset Based Lending Fund, I, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Summons)(Pallesen, Bryn)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pender Capital Asset Based Lending Fund, I, LP from Palmer Superior Court, case number 3PA-19-02407CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2792043), filed by Pender Capital Asset Based Lending Fund, I, LP.(Pallesen, Bryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Pender Capital Asset Based Lending Fund, I, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Reynolds
Represented By: B. Neil Ainsworth
Represented By: Breeman Neal Ainsworth, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pender Capital Asset Based Lending Fund I, LP
Represented By: Bryn Resser Pallesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?