Tomelleri v. State of Alaska
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Defendant: State of Alaska
Case Number: 3:2019cv00312
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Referring Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER FROM CHAMBERS: An answer has not been filed by one or more defendants served in this case. Where the time to answer has expired, require an answer immediately or apply for default within 21 days from the date of this minute order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 22, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE re #10 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott Joseph Strohm, at docket #10 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Scott Joseph Strohm. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2819132.) by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MO Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit W.D. MO Certificate of Good Standing)(Strohm, Scott)
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert H. Schmidt on behalf of State of Alaska (Schmidt, Robert)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re Case Reassigned. By agreement of the judges, this case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Sharon L. Gleason. The following case number shall be used on all future filings: 3:19-cv-00312-SLG. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph R. Tomelleri re #6 Order re Motions to Dismiss (Gross, David)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 12/27/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 24, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on State of Alaska on 12/20/2019, filed by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt Card)(Gross, David)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the filing or determination of an action for appeal regarding a copyright. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to State of Alaska. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant State of Alaska, (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of Alaska (Filing fee $400/receipt #ANC016440.), filed by Joseph R. Tomelleri.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomelleri v. State of Alaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Represented By: David Karl Gross
Represented By: Scott Joseph Strohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska
Represented By: Robert H. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?