Burton v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Burton
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc., Tissue Science Laboratories Limited and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00004
Filed: January 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Referring Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 41 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-22539. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 31, 2019 Filing 40 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7118 - Notice of Adoption, #2 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7119 - Notice of Adoption, #3 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7123 - Notice of Adoption, #4 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7143 - Notice of Adoption, #5 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7177 - Notice of Adoption, #6 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7183 - Reply in Further Support of Motion to Exclude)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/1/2020 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Filing 39 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #5482 - Response Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #2 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #5548 - Reply in Support of Defs Motion to Exclude, #3 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6648 - Notice of Adoption, #4 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6821 - Notice of Adoption, #5 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6824 - Notice of Adoption, #6 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6833 - Amended Notice of Adoption, #7 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6840 - Notice of Adoption, #8 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6852 - Notice of Adoption, #9 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6860 - Notice of Adoption, #10 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6863 - Notice of Adoption, #11 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6864 - Notice of Adoption, #12 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6874 - Motion to Exclude, #13 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6875 - Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude, #14 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6926 - Notice of Adoption, #15 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6958 - Notice of Adoption, #16 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6960 - Notice of Adoption, #17 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6965 - Notice of Adoption, #18 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6973 - Notice of Adoption, #19 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6985 - Notice of Adoption, #20 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6993 - Notice of Adoption, #21 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #6998 - Notice of Adoption, #22 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7038 - Notice of Adoption, #23 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7045 - Plfs Opposition to Defs Motion to Exclude, #24 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7085 - Amended Adoption of Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #25 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #7100 - Notice of Adoption)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/1/2020 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Filing 38 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2931 - Memo by All Plfs in Opposition to Defs Motion to Exclude, #2 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2942 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #3 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2949 - Memo by All Plfs in Opposition to Defs Motion, #4 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3017 - Reply by Ethicon in Support of Motion to Exclude, #5 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3024 - Reply by Ethicon in Support of Motion to Exclude, #6 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3051 - Plfs Reply to Motion To Exclude, #7 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3053 - Reply by All Plfs in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude, #8 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3619 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #9 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3619 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #10 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3621 - Memo of Law in Support of Motion to Exclude, #11 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3626 Part 1 - Motion to Limit, #12 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3626 Part 2 - Motion to Limit, #13 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3630 - Memo in Support of Motion to Limit, #14 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3767 Part 1 - Response by Defs Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #15 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3767 Part 2 - Response by Defs Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #16 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3767 Part 3 - Response by Defs Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #17 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3767 Part 4 - Response by Defs Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #18 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3790 Part 1 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #19 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3790 Part 2 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #20 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3790 Part 3 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #21 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3844 - Reply to Notice of Adoption, #22 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3855 - Reply in Support of Motion to Limit, #23 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #3865 - Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude, #24 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #5332 - Motion to Exclude Certain General Opinions, #25 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #5333 - Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/1/2020 to add party filer)(mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Filing 37 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2134 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #2 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2143 - Response to Plfs Amended Motion to Exclude, #3 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2205 Part 1 - Motion by All Plfs to Exclude, #4 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2205 Part 2 - Motion by All Plfs to Exclude, #5 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2205 Part 3 - Motion by All Plfs to Exclude, #6 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2206 - Memo in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude, #7 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2232 - Plfs' Reply Brief in Support of Their Daubert Motion, #8 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2234 - Reply by All Plfs in Support of their Motion, #9 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2287 Part 1 - Defs Response in Opposition to Motion, #10 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2287 Part 2 - Defs Response in Opposition to Motion, #11 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2297 - Plfs' Reply to Defs Response, #12 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2417 - Motion to Exclude, #13 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2466 - Memo in Support of Plfs Motion to Exclude, #14 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2488 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #15 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2552 Part 1 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #16 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2552 Part 2 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #17 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2552 Part 3 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #18 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2759 - Defs Motion to Exclude, #19 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2760 - Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude, #20 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2817 - Defs Motion to Exclude, #21 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2818 - Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude, #22 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2825 - Motion to Exclude or Limit, #23 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2826 - Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude or Limit, #24 Exhibit ECF #36 CONTINUED, ECF #2910 - Notice of Response and Adoption, #25 Exhibit ECF #2927 - Response by Ethicon in Opposition)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/1/2020 to add party filer)(mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Filing 36 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #238 - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit ECF #239 - Master Answer and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit ECF #241 - Master Answer and Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit ECF #262 - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit ECF #263 - Amended Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit ECF #1986 - Amended Motion by All Plfs to Exclude, #7 Exhibit ECF #1988 - Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude, #8 Exhibit ECF #2041 - Plfs' Motion to Exclude, #9 Exhibit ECF #2043 - Memo in Support of Plfs Motion to Exclude, #10 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #11 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #12 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 3 - Motion to Exclude, #13 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 4 - Motion to Exclude, #14 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 5 - Motion to Exclude, #15 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 6 - Motion to Exclude, #16 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 7 - Motion to Exclude, #17 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 8 - Motion to Exclude, #18 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 9 - Motion to Exclude, #19 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 10 - Motion to Exclude, #20 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 11 - Motion to Exclude, #21 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 12 - Motion to Exclude, #22 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 13 - Motion to Exclude, #23 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 14 - Motion to Exclude, #24 Exhibit ECF #2060 - Motion by All Plfs to Exclude, #25 Exhibit ECF #2065 - Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/1/2020 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 1/09/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 1/08/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/19/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - List of Cases, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 - Letter)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Barbara Burton (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 30 OPPOSITION by Barbara Burton to #26 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITIONS OF FRIENDS AND FAMILY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Roger Wilson on a date and at a time to be determined. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #26 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendant's Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendant's Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
July 14, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kasey Mitchell Adams on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Adams, Kasey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 22 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Barbara Burton on 7/16/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Barbara Burton on 7/16/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Barbara Burton for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
May 31, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Subpoena by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson re: #17 Notice to Take or Amend Deposition (Attachments: #1 Appendix Schedule A, #2 Appendix Deposition Protocol)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
May 31, 2018 Filing 17 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Donna L. Chester on 6/18/2018 at 1:00 p.m. (Attachment: #1 PTO #38)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
March 28, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christopher D. Morris on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Morris, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
March 23, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Anita Modak-Truran on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Donna L. Chester on 3/8/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 11 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Barbara Burton. (Gomez, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
April 20, 2017 Filing 10 AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT filed by Barbara Burton against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (Dismissing Defendants C. R. Bard, Inc. and Covidien Entities with Prejudice And Transferring Cases to MDL 2327) granting the Joint Motion to Dismiss Certain Defendants with Prejudice filed in MDL 2187 by plaintiffs, identified on the attached Exhibit A, and to the extent they are named, C. R. Bard, Inc., and Sofradim Production SAS, Tissue Science Laboratories Limited, and Covidien LP, seeking dismissal of Bard and the Covidien entities from these actions with prejudice because all claims between them have been compromised and settled; Plaintiffs' Counsel is DIRECTED to file the appropriate Amended Short Form Complaints within the time frame outlined in the Motion; Defendants Bard and Covidien are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as defendants in the actions listed in Exhibit A, these actions are TRANSFERRED to MDL 2327, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to disassociate these civil actions as member cases in MDL 2187 and re-associate them with MDL 2327. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/29/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
March 27, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
December 27, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Deborah A. Moeller on behalf of Tissue Science Laboratories Limited. (Moeller, Deborah) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
October 4, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Melissa Foster Bird on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Bird, Melissa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
October 1, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Richard B. North, Jr on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (North, Richard) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
September 26, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
September 13, 2013 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Richard B. North, Jr. on 9/12/2013. C. R. Bard, Inc. waiver mailed on 9/5/2013, answer due 11/4/2013. (North, Richard) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
September 5, 2013 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 85 (AMENDED ORDER REGARDING DELAYED FILING AND APPLICATION TO THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS) entered on 08/29/2013 in MDL 2187 to attorneys in member case. (cbo) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]
September 4, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2639784. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Service Under Delayed Filing Agreement) (jws) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Kasey Mitchell Adams
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Christopher D. Morris
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Represented By: Rebecca A. Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tissue Science Laboratories Limited
Represented By: Deborah A. Moeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Kasey Mitchell Adams
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Christopher D. Morris
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Represented By: Rebecca A. Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Burton
Represented By: Lee B. Balefsky
Represented By: Michelle L. Tiger
Represented By: Christopher A. Gomez
Represented By: Alison Vetrini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?