Mitchell v. McCarthy
Plaintiff: Mary D. Mitchell
Defendant: Ryan D. McCarthy
Case Number: 3:2020cv00009
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary D. Mitchell. Ryan D. McCarthy served on 1/23/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Teresa Garcia, #2 Proof of Service Randy Choiniera)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 2/6/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 16, 2020 Summons Issued as to Ryan D. McCarthy. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant McCarthy (BJK, COURT STAFF)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION Requesting Volunteer Attorney by Mary D. Mitchell.(BJK, COURT STAFF)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (BJK, COURT STAFF)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ryan D. McCarthy (Filing fee $ 400.00 ANC016534), filed by Mary D. Mitchell.(BJK, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary D. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan D. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?