Velasco v. McCarthy
Plaintiff: Francisco Velasco, III
Defendant: Ryan D. McCarthy
Case Number: 3:2020cv00010
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Referring Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Francisco Velasco, III. Ryan D. McCarthy (Department of the Army Randy P. Choiniere) served on 1/21/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified mail return receipt 7019 2280 0001 6459 4822)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 30, 2020 Filing 6 SLG TEXT ORDER: By agreement of the Judges, this case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Ralph R. Beistline for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:20-cv-00010-RRB. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ryan D. McCarthy, filed by Francisco Velasco, III.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ryan D. McCarthy, filed by Francisco Velasco, III.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 16, 2020 Summons Issued as to Ryan D. McCarthy. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant McCarthy, (BJK, COURT STAFF)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (BJK, COURT STAFF)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ryan D. McCarthy (Filing fee $ 400.00 ANC 016534), filed by Francisco Velasco, III.(BJK, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasco v. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Velasco, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan D. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?