Injasoulian v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wanda L. Injasoulian
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00015
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Referring Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Filing 27 TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING #25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. With Defendants consent, Susan M. Robinson is terminated as counsel of record. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
March 16, 2020 Filing 26 TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING #24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. With Defendants consent, David B. Thomas is terminated as counsel of record. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
February 28, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Susan Robinson by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Consent to Withdraw)(Modak-Truran, Anita)
February 28, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of David Thomas by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Consent to Withdraw)(Modak-Truran, Anita)
February 21, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Withdrawal of William Gage by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Modak-Truran, Anita)
February 21, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Kari Sutherland by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Modak-Truran, Anita)
February 21, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Christy D. Jones by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Modak-Truran, Anita)
February 20, 2020 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE re #18 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anita Modak-Truran, at docket #18 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (RMC, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2020 Filing 19 Receipt of 150 non-resident attorney payment for Anita Modak-Truran as to Defendant Johnson & Johnson. re #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Anita Modak-Truran (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 18, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Anita Modak-Truran by Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lindemann, Rebecca)
February 6, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca A. Lindemann on behalf of All Defendants (Lindemann, Rebecca)
January 27, 2020 Filing 16 JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER: Judge Sedwick hereby recuses himself from presiding in this matter. This case has been reassigned by random draw to the Honorable Timothy M. Burgess for all further proceedings. Please use the following case for all future filings: 3:20-cv-00015-TMB. (CME, COURT STAFF)
January 24, 2020 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:14-cv-20233. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (238) First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit (239) Master Answer and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit (241) Master Answer and Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit (262) Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit (263) Amended Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A - Emails reaching out regarding Joint Designation)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 1/23/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 1/22/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/9/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Wanda L. Injasoulian (Jensen, Keith) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - List of Cases, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 - Letter)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (sak) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
July 12, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
September 4, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
August 14, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
July 7, 2014 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 125 (Initial Order Regarding Severance of Actions) entered on 07/02/2014 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (kw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
July 2, 2014 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3302291. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mlh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Injasoulian v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda L. Injasoulian
Represented By: Brandon H. Steffey
Represented By: Keith M. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?