Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Big Dreams Transport Ltd.
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Big Dreams Transport Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00028
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re Case Dismissed. This case is dismissed with prejudice, the parties to bear their respective costs and fees. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 3/19/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 18, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUCIDE PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Southwick, Joshua)
March 17, 2020 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Big Dreams Transport Ltd. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua A. Southwick in Support of Request to Enter Default, #2 Proposed Order Granting Request for Entry of Default)(Southwick, Joshua)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re defendant has been served. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 3/6/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 2/20/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 Receipt of 150 non-resident attorney payment for Joshua A. Southwick as to Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Joshua A. Southwick (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE (Certificate of Good Standing) by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Joshua A. Southwick (Southwick, Joshua)
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Big Dreams Transport Ltd. served on 2/13/2020, answer due 3/5/2020. (Southwick, Joshua)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM FOR MOTION AND APPLICATION OF NON-ELIGIBLE ATTORNEY FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAR AND PARTICIPATE IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF ALASKA by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Joshua A. Southwick filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Southwick, Joshua)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Joshua A. Southwick by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Southwick, Joshua)
February 7, 2020 Summons Issued as to Big Dreams Transport Ltd. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Big Dreams Transports Ltd. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Southwick, Joshua)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Big Dreams Transport Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2830451.), filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Southwick, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Big Dreams Transport Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Dreams Transport Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Joshua A. Southwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?