Shooshanian v. Healthcare America, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Loreal Shooshanian
Defendant: Alaska Regional Hospital, Healthcare America, LLC, Galen Hospital Alaska, Inc. and Healthcare America, LLC a Limited Liability company oranized under the laws of Nevada doing business as Alaska Regional Hospital
Case Number: 3:2020cv00031
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by Galen Hospital Alaska, Inc..(Wang, Thomas)
March 31, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alaska Regional Hospital, Galen Hospital Alaska, Inc., filed by Loreal Shooshanian.(Josephson, Joseph)
March 31, 2020 Summons Issued as to Galen Hospital Alaska, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 31, 2020 Filing 11 Unissued summons re Defendant Galen Hospital Alaska, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend/Correct. Galen Hospital Alaska, Inc. is added as a defendant in this matter; Defendant Healthcare America, LLC is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 3/30/2020. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
March 27, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Loreal Shooshanian re #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint Unopposed (Josephson, Joseph)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint Unopposed by Loreal Shooshanian. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant, #3 Proposed Order)(Josephson, Joseph)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER: It appears from a statement in defense counsels notice of appearance that Healthcare America, LLC has no connection to Alaska Regional Hospital. Counsel shall confer, and then file an amended complaint if that is appropriate within 7 days. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Alaska Regional Hospital.(Wang, Thomas)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas V. Wang, Jr on behalf of Alaska Regional Hospital (Wang, Thomas)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 2/24/2020. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
February 13, 2020 Summons Issued as to Alaska Regional Hospital, Healthcare America, LLC. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Healthcare America, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Alaska Regional Hospital)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Josephson, Joseph)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2832943.), filed by Loreal Shooshanian.(Josephson, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shooshanian v. Healthcare America, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Regional Hospital
Represented By: Thomas V. Wang, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galen Hospital Alaska, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas V. Wang, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare America, LLC a Limited Liability company oranized under the laws of Nevada doing business as Alaska Regional Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loreal Shooshanian
Represented By: Joseph P. Josephson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?