Alaska Resource Education v. Brunner et al
Plaintiff: Alaska Resource Education
Defendant: Michelle Brunner and Todd Brunner
Case Number: 3:2020cv00036
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Referring Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file parties report on or before 5/21/2020. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 4/9/20. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling and Planning Conference Report)(JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 31, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Michelle Brunner.(Nesbett, Michelle)
March 24, 2020 Filing 13 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the terms of the parties stipulation at Docket #12 . The stipulation is APPROVED and IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Michelle Brunner shall comply with the terms of that stipulation pending further order of the Court or the conclusion of this action. AREs motion at Docket 8 is WITHDRAWN and the hearing on the motion is VACATED. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and Order to Withdraw Motion at Dkt. 8 and Agreement of the Parties by Michelle Brunner.(Nesbett, Michelle)
March 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Nesbett on behalf of Michelle Brunner (Nesbett, Michelle)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: The Motion for a Temporary Retraining Order is DENIED without prejudice. A hearing on the Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is set for 3/27/2020 at 10:00 AM. Opposition by Defendants due 3/23/2020, Plaintiff reply due 3/25/2020. All parties shall appear telephonically by calling 877-402-9753 (access code 6288202) from a land line telephone five minutes prior to the scheduled hearing. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 3/19/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 19, 2020 Filing 9 JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL: The assigned judge hereby recuses from presiding in this case. This case has been re-assigned by random draw to Hon. Sharon L. Gleason. The case number henceforth will be 3:20-cv-00036-SLG. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Alaska Resource Education. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Debra Mason, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Ella Ede, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jungreis, Michael)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 2/28/2020. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alaska Resource Education Return of Service Notarized (Jungreis, Michael)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alaska Resource Education. (Jungreis, Michael)
February 19, 2020 Summons Issued as to Todd Brunner. (KMC, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Todd Brunner (KMC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 2/19/2020 to correct defendant(PXS, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2020 Summons Issued as to Michelle Brunner. (KMC, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Michelle Brunner (KMC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 2/19/2020 to correct defendant (PXS, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (KMC, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michelle Brunner, Todd Brunner (Filing fee $ 400/Receipt #ANC016627.), filed by Alaska Resource Education. (Attachments: # 1 Unissued Summons re Defendant 1, # 2 Unissued Summons re Defendant 2)(KMC, COURT STAFF) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/19/2020) (PXS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/19/2020 to replaced main document and regenerate the NEF(PXS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alaska Resource Education v. Brunner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Brunner
Represented By: Michelle Nesbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Brunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Resource Education
Represented By: Michael Jungreis
Represented By: Keri-Ann Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?