Bank of Utah et al v. LADY GUDNY, Official No. 615085 et al
Plaintiff: Peter Pan Seafoods, Inc. and Bank of Utah
Defendant: LADY GUDNY, Official No. 615085, Steven Johnson and Lady Gudney LLC or LG L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00040
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Filing 14 UMS 285 Process Receipt and Return as to LADY GUDNY, Official No. 615085. Vessel arrest on 3/6/2020. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 11, 2020 Filing 13 UMS 285 Process Receipt and Return as to LADY GUDNY, Official No. 615085. Release to Substitute Custodian; serve at Marine Lenders Services, LLC on 3/6/2020. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 24, 2020 WARRANT of In Rem Arrest issued. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem; granting #6 Motion to Appoint Custodian Marine Lenders Services, LLC, appointed. See order for details. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 2/24/2020. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
February 21, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of Utah, Peter Pan Seafoods, Inc.. (Casperson, John)
February 21, 2020 Filing 10 SLG TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion For Expedited Consideration of Motion for Warrant for Arrest is at Docket #3 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Motion for Expedited Consideration of Motion for Substitute Custodian at Docket #4 is GRANTED. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to Steven Johnson, Lady Gudney LLC or LG L.L.C.. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 20, 2020 Filing 9 Unissued summons re Defendant STEVEN JOHNSON, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Lady Gudney LLC or LG L.L.C.)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION of John E. Casperson re #3 MOTION to Expedite Motion for Expedited Consideration of Motion for Warrant for Arrest by Bank of Utah, Peter Pan Seafoods, Inc.. (Casperson, John)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE Certification of Buck Fowler (28 U.S.C. 1746) by Bank of Utah, Peter Pan Seafoods, Inc. re #6 MOTION to Appoint Custodian Motion for Order Appointing Substitute Custodian and for Permission to Allow Boarding and Inspection (Casperson, John)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Custodian Motion for Order Appointing Substitute Custodian and for Permission to Allow Boarding and Inspection by Bank of Utah, Peter Pan Seafoods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Casperson, John)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem Plaintiffs Motion for Order Authorizing Arrest of Vessel by Bank of Utah, Peter Pan Seafoods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 In Rem Arrest Warrant)(Casperson, John)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite Motion for Expedited Consideration of Motion for Substitute Custodian by Bank of Utah, Peter Pan Seafoods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Casperson, John)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Expedite Motion for Expedited Consideration of Motion for Warrant for Arrest by Bank of Utah, Peter Pan Seafoods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Casperson, John)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Casperson, John)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steven Johnson, LADY GUDNY, Official No. 615085, Lady Gudney LLC or LG L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2835796.), filed by Bank of Utah, Peter Pan Seafoods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Casperson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of Utah et al v. LADY GUDNY, Official No. 615085 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LADY GUDNY, Official No. 615085
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lady Gudney LLC or LG L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Pan Seafoods, Inc.
Represented By: John E. Casperson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of Utah
Represented By: John E. Casperson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?