Grant Aviation, Inc. v. Serco Inc.
Plaintiff: Grant Aviation, Inc.
Defendant: Serco Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00043
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Walsh on behalf of Serco Inc. (Walsh, William)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 3/17/2020. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Grant Aviation, Inc.. (Wilhelm, Marc)
February 25, 2020 Summons Issued as to Grant Aviation, Inc.. (KMC, COURT STAFF)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Serco, Inc., (KMC, COURT STAFF)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (KMC, COURT STAFF)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Serco Inc. (Filing fee $ 400/Receipt #ANC016652), filed by Grant Aviation, Inc..(KMC, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant Aviation, Inc. v. Serco Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serco Inc.
Represented By: William H. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L. Richmond
Represented By: Marc G. Wilhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?