Thews v. Saul
Plaintiff: Catherine Thews
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv00055
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catherine Thews. Andrew Saul served on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Osterhout, Karl)
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E Skrocki on behalf of Andrew Saul (Skrocki, Steven)
March 16, 2020 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 Unissued summons re Defendant AG, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Commissioner of SSA, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant USAtty)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 JUDGE BEISTLINE TEXT ORDER: The Motion and Application of Non-Eligible Attorney for Permission to Appear and Participate in the United States District Court for the District of Alaska and Rule 83.1(d)(B) Request for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel (Pro Hac Vice) filed by Attorney Karl E. Osterhout is GRANTED. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Karl E. Osterhout by Catherine Thews.(Osterhout, Karl)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Karl E. Osterhout filed by Catherine Thews. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 3/9/2020. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Good Standing/MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Karl E. Osterhout. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2845170.) by Catherine Thews.(Osterhout, Karl) Modified on 3/20/2020 to clarify text. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Osterhout, Karl)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2845155.), filed by Catherine Thews.(Osterhout, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thews v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Steven E Skrocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Thews
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?