Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada v. Messenger et al
Plaintiff: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Defendant: Beau K. Mikels-McClure and Andrea Messenger
Case Number: 3:2020cv00064
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re Notice of Settlement. Closing papers or status report due 6/8/2020. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re Case Status. Defendants to file their answers or other responses to plaintiff's complaint as soon as possible, but no later than 6/4/2020. See Order for additional deadlines. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Waiver of Service of Summons served on Defendant Andrea Messenger on 3/13/2020, filed by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Buhite, Russell)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. Beau K. Mikels-McClure waiver sent on 3/13/2020, answer due 5/12/2020. (Buhite, Russell)
March 19, 2020 Summons Issued as to Andrea Messenger, Beau K. Mikels-McClure. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant A. Messenger, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Beau)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Buhite, Russell)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Buhite, Russell)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader Relief against Andrea Messenger, Beau K. Mikels-McClure ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2848689.), filed by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Unissued Summons re Defendant, #11 Unissued Summons re Defendant)(Buhite, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada v. Messenger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Represented By: Russell S. Buhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beau K. Mikels-McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Messenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?