Creed et al v. Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52 et al
Plaintiff: Linda Creed and Tyler Riberio
Defendant: Kelly Tshibaka and Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52
Case Number: 3:2020cv00065
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE re #25 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven C. Begakis, at docket #25 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 1, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Steven C. Begakis. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2871887.) by Kelly Tshibaka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Standing)(Begakis, Steven)
April 22, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION by Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jake Metcalfe in Support of ASEA's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Metcalfe Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Metcalfe Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Metcalfe Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Metcalfe Declaration)(Murray, Matthew)
April 21, 2020 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE re #21 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William S. Consovoy, at docket #21 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 21, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE re #20 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Connolly, at docket #20 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 20, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney William S. Consovoy. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2866546.) by Kelly Tshibaka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jurisdiction List, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Standing)(Consovoy, William)
April 20, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney J. Michael Connolly. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2866535.) by Kelly Tshibaka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jurisdiction List, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Standing)(Connolly, John)
April 16, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE re #15 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stefanie L. Wilson, at docket #15 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 16, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE re #13 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew J. Murray, at docket #13 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 16, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE re #11 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott A. Kronland, at docket #11 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 16, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Stefanie L. Wilson re #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Stefanie L. Wilson. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2865173.) by Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Jurisdictions, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Brown, Molly)
April 16, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Stefanie L. Wilson. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2865173.) by Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52.(Brown, Molly)
April 16, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Matthew J. Murray re #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Matthew J. Murray. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2865109.) by Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Brown, Molly)
April 16, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Matthew J. Murray. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2865109.) by Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52.(Brown, Molly)
April 16, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Scott A. Kronland re #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Scott A. Kronland. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2865080.) by Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Brown, Molly)
April 16, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Scott A. Kronland. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2865080.) by Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52.(Brown, Molly)
April 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly C. Brown on behalf of Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52 (Brown, Molly)
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Andrew Higgins on behalf of Kelly Tshibaka (Higgins, Kevin)
April 15, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Linda Creed, Tyler Riberio. Kelly Tshibaka waiver sent on 3/16/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. (Suhr, Daniel)
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE re #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Robert Suhr, at docket #3 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE Certificate of Good Standing by Linda Creed, Tyler Riberio re #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Daniel R. Suhr. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2849062.) (Suhr, Daniel)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 3/25/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Linda Creed, Tyler Riberio. Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52 waiver sent on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Suhr, Daniel)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Daniel R. Suhr. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2849062.) by Linda Creed, Tyler Riberio.(Suhr, Daniel)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Suhr, Daniel)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52, Kelly Tshibaka ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2849020.), filed by Linda Creed, Tyler Riberio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Collective Bargaining Agreement, #2 Exhibit Union Card, #3 Exhibit AG Opinion, #4 Exhibit Administrative Order)(Suhr, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creed et al v. Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Tshibaka
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Represented By: Steven Christopher Begakis
Represented By: John Michael Connolly
Represented By: Kevin Andrew Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52
Represented By: Stefanie L. Wilson
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Matthew J. Murray
Represented By: Molly C. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Creed
Represented By: Sonja Kathleen Redmond
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Riberio
Represented By: Sonja Kathleen Redmond
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?