Newtok Village v. Lynden Air Cargo, LLC
Plaintiff: Newtok Village
Defendant: Lynden Air Cargo, LLC and Lynden Air Cargo, LLC doing business as Lynden Air Cargo
Case Number: 3:2020cv00071
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR REMAND BY THE PARTIES by Newtok Village.(Walleri, Michael)
April 13, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of state court filings by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Waller, Thomas)
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 TMB TEXT ORDER vacating re #9 Initial Case Status Report Order pursuant to MGO 20-11. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Newtok Village. (Walleri, Michael)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 4/1/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC (Waller, Thomas)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC.(Waller, Thomas)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Thomas Waller re #1 Notice of Removal, by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Waller, Thomas)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC. (Waller, Thomas)
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Thomas Waller re #1 Notice of Removal, by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Waller, Thomas)
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Waller, Thomas)
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC from Alaska Superior Court, 4th Judicial District at Bethel, case number 4BE-20-86 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2853796), filed by Lynden Air Cargo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of complaint)(Waller, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newtok Village v. Lynden Air Cargo, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newtok Village
Represented By: Michael J. Walleri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynden Air Cargo, LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynden Air Cargo, LLC doing business as Lynden Air Cargo
Represented By: Thomas G. Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?