Fries v. USAA General Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Fries
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00076
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 13 JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER: The stipulation at docket #12 for dismissal with prejudice and with each party bearing such partys own costs and fees is effective without a court order. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Clerk will please close this case. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
May 15, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Dismissal by USAA General Indemnity Company.(Bowman, Timothy) Modified on 5/18/2020 to modify event type. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
May 11, 2020 Filing 11 JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT STATUS REPORT ORDER. The court has reviewed the notice at docket 10. Unless closing papers are sooner filed, a status report shall be filed on June 8, 2020. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by USAA General Indemnity Company (Bowman, Timothy)
May 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2020. Discovery due by 4/21/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 6/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2021. See Order for all other deadlines. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 5/3/2020. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bowman, Timothy)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 4/9/20. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling and Planning Conference Report)(JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Bowman, Timothy)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by USAA General Indemnity Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Rule 4 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D - IPO, #5 Exhibit E - NOA, #6 Exhibit F - Jury Demand, #7 Exhibit G - Notice of Removal)(Bowman, Timothy)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by USAA General Indemnity Company (Bowman, Timothy)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Bowman, Timothy)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowman, Timothy)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USAA General Indemnity Company from Anchorage Superior Court, case number 3AN-20-05147CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2858335), filed by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Complaint)(Bowman, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fries v. USAA General Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: Timothy W. Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Fries
Represented By: Robert J. Jurasek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?