Ferguson et al v. Hussain et al
Plaintiff: Danny B. Ferguson and Jennings Sturgeon
Defendant: Syed Hussain, Alaska All in 1, LLC, Serj Organics, LLC, Jafar Rashid and Alaska Farm and Garden
Case Number: 3:2020cv00103
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Alaska All in 1, LLC, Alaska Farm and Garden, Jafar Rashid, Serj Organics, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(Richards, Craig)
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT Certificate of Good Standing by Alaska All in 1, LLC, Alaska Farm and Garden, Syed Hussain, Serj Organics, LLC re Docket Annotation, #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Jon A. Atabek. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2873528.). (Richards, Craig)
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Alaska All in 1, LLC, Alaska Farm and Garden, Jafar Rashid, Serj Organics, LLC (Richards, Craig)
May 18, 2020 Docket Annotation: Error re #3 Motion and Application of Non-Eligible Attorney. A Certificate of Good Standing was not attached as required pursuant to Local Rule 83.1. Correction: Attorney shall file the Certificate of Good Standing using the event "Other Documents", "Additional Related Document". Attorney shall also register for CM/ECF by filing the Registration Form located on the Court's public website at www.akd.uscourts.gov. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon A. Atabek, at docket #3 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JDS, COURT STAFF)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 First CROSSCLAIM against Syed Hussain, filed by Serj Organics, LLC, Alaska All in 1, LLC, Alaska Farm and Garden, Jafar Rashid.(Richards, Craig)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ISO MOTION TO DISMISS by Alaska All in 1, LLC, Alaska Farm and Garden, Jafar Rashid, Serj Organics, LLC #4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Serj Organics, LLC, Alaska Farm and Garden, Alaska All in 1, LLC, Jafar Rashid. (Richards, Craig)
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Alaska All in 1, LLC, Alaska Farm and Garden, Jafar Rashid, Serj Organics, LLC.(Richards, Craig)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Jon A. Atabek. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2873528.) by Alaska All in 1, LLC, Jafar Rashid, Serj Organics, LLC.(Richards, Craig)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Richards, Craig)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Serj Organics, LLC, Alaska All in 1, LLC, Jafar Rashid from Alaska Superior Court, case number 3AN-20-05943 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2873511), filed by Serj Organics, LLC, Alaska All in 1, LLC, Jafar Rashid. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment)(Richards, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson et al v. Hussain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syed Hussain
Represented By: Craig W. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska All in 1, LLC
Represented By: Craig W. Richards
Represented By: Jon Ali Atabek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serj Organics, LLC
Represented By: Craig W. Richards
Represented By: Jon Ali Atabek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jafar Rashid
Represented By: Craig W. Richards
Represented By: Jon Ali Atabek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Farm and Garden
Represented By: Craig W. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny B. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennings Sturgeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?