Reft v. J.C. Penney Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mary Reft
Defendant: J.C. Penney Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00106
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Suggestion on Pendency of Bankruptcy for JC Penney Company, Inc., et al. and Automatic Stay of Proceedings by J.C. Penney Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wilkson, Whitney)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 5/19/2020. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by J.C. Penney Company, Inc. (Wilkson, Whitney)
May 12, 2020 Filing fee: $400, receipt number ANC016851 (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by J.C. Penney Company, Inc. from State of Alaska Third Judicial District, case number 3AN-20-04300 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 ANC016851), filed by J.C. Penney Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(LMH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 5/12/2020 to add receipt number(BJK, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reft v. J.C. Penney Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Reft
Represented By: Timothy M. Twomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. Penney Company, Inc.
Represented By: Whitney L. Wilkson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?