Estate of Paulette J. Adkins v. The Bank of New York Mellon et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Paulette J. Adkins
Defendant: Newrez LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 3:2020cv00115
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Joshua M Kindred
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 7/7/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants.(Brown, Jessica)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer UNOPPPOSED All Defendants. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 6/22/2020. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
June 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel for Defendants by Newrez LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon (Scully, Peter)
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer UNOPPPOSED by Newrez LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scully, Peter)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons to NewRez, LLC, #2 Summons to Bank of New York, #3 Mtn for Expedited Consideration, #4 Mtn for Temp Injunction, #5 Undertaking, #6 Order granting expedited consideration, #7 Order re Temp Injunction, #8 Mtn for Extension of Temp Injunction, #9 Mtn for Expedited Consideration of Motion for Extension, #10 Return of Service as to NewRez, LLC, #11 Notice of Deficient Filing(s), #12 Certificate of Service, #13 Order on Undertaking, #14 Order granting expedited consideration, #15 Order on extension of time for CR 65 Injunction, #16 Notice, #17 Notice ofg Filing Notice of Removal, #18 Notice of Removal to Adverse Party)(Scully, Peter)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed. Answers due 6/19/2020. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 6/4/2020. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by Newrez LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scully, Peter)
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by All Defendants (Scully, Peter)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Scully, Peter)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Bank of New York Mellon, Newrez LLC from State of Alaska Superior Court, Third Judicial District at Anchorage, case number 3AN-20-05977CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2880273), filed by The Bank of New York Mellon, Newrez LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint)(Scully, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Paulette J. Adkins v. The Bank of New York Mellon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newrez LLC
Represented By: Peter Andrew Scully
Represented By: Jessica M.Y. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Peter Andrew Scully
Represented By: Jessica M.Y. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Paulette J. Adkins
Represented By: Clayton H Walker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?