Malin et al v. Osprey Underwriting Agency Limited et al
Plaintiff: Heather Malin and Mariya McNeese
Defendant: Wells Fargo Insurance Services USA, Inc., Osprey Underwriting Agency Limited and Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's
Case Number: 3:2020cv00119
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 12 JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER: The order at docket 9 is hereby modified by deleting the last two sentences referring to Mr. Berne. They were included in the order as a result of an error by the Clerks staff. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
June 10, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE re #10 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Colin Folawn, at docket #10 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (SDW, COURT STAFF)
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Colin Folawn by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, Osprey Underwriting Agency Limited.(Folawn, Colin) Modified on 6/10/2020 to create relationship to document #5. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 **AMENDED AT DKT 12** JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER: It appears to the court that Mr. Folawn is a member of a law firm which is closely related to the firm of which Mr. Ray is a member. Mr. Folawn's request at docket #5 to appear pro hac vice without association of local counsel is denied without prejudice to a motion to appear in association with Mr. Ray or a motion to appear without association which explains why Mr. Folawn will not associate with Mr. Ray. Mr. Berne is not a member of the bar of this court. He shall either successfully apply to become a member or move to appear pro hac vice. (SDW, COURT STAFF) Modified on 6/10/2020 to create relationship to document #5. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 6/9/2020. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE COLIN FOLAWN CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, Osprey Underwriting Agency Limited re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Colin J. Folawn. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2887117.) (Folawn, Colin)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 6/8/2020. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Colin J. Folawn. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2887117.) by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, Osprey Underwriting Agency Limited.(Folawn, Colin)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Herbert H. Ray, Jr on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, Osprey Underwriting Agency Limited (Ray, Herbert)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Thomas Berne on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, Osprey Underwriting Agency Limited (Berne, Zachary)
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, Osprey Underwriting Agency Limited, Wells Fargo Insurance Services USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2881409.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Seaman's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Stipulation for Entry of Judgment, #3 Exhibit Final Judgment)(Choate, Mark)
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Cover Sheet. (Choate, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malin et al v. Osprey Underwriting Agency Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Insurance Services USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osprey Underwriting Agency Limited
Represented By: Colin J. Folawn
Represented By: Zachary Thomas Berne
Represented By: Herbert H. Ray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's
Represented By: Herbert H. Ray, Jr.
Represented By: Zachary Thomas Berne
Represented By: Colin J. Folawn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Malin
Represented By: Mark C. Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariya McNeese
Represented By: Mark C. Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?