Kambic v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., et al.
Plaintiff: William Kambic and William J. Kambic, Jr.
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A., The Sayer Law Group P.C., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and The Sayer Law Group, P.C.
Counter Defendant: Juanita M. Suarez, Juanita Mendiola and Juanita Kambic
Case Number: 3:2020cv00120
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Complaint by The Sayer Law Group, P.C..(Hojnacki, Darren)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying #17 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 7/14/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 14, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian G. Sayer on behalf of The Sayer Law Group, P.C. (Sayer, Brian)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER: Trial Briefs due by 11/8/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 03:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 3. Trial by Jury set for 11/29/2021 at 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 3 before Sharon L. Gleason. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 7/10/2020. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/2/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2021. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 7/8/2020. (CFR, Chambers Staff)
July 8, 2020 Filing 28 SLG TEXT ORDER: Counter Defendant Juanita M. Suarezs unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer at Docket #26 is GRANTED. Ms. Suarez shall file her answer no later than July 27, 2020. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
July 6, 2020 Filing 27 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by Juanita M. Suarez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Darryl)
July 6, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl L. Thompson on behalf of Juanita M. Suarez (Thompson, Darryl)
June 25, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Of Juanita M. Suarez, aka Juanita Mendiola aka Juanita Kambic (Curran, Leigh)
June 25, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY in Support re #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings On First Amended Complaint Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Curran, Leigh) Modified on 6/26/2020 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2020 Filing 23 DECLARATION of George M. Cruickshank In Support of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A's Opposition to Motion to Stay District Court Action re #22 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Curran, Leigh)
June 24, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Stay re #3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings On First Amended Complaint Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c), #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Curran, Leigh)
June 22, 2020 Filing 21 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by William J. Kambic, Jr.(Dawson, Wayne)
June 22, 2020 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Curran, Leigh)
June 19, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings On First Amended Complaint Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) filed by William J. Kambic, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Granting in Part Wells Fargo Bank N.A.s Motion to Dismiss under Alaska R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) & (9(b), #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration, #3 Exhibit Order Granting in Part Case Motion No. 3, #4 Exhibit Mortgage Assistance Application, #5 Exhibit Notice of Default)(Dawson, Wayne)
June 12, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE To District Court That State Court Has Received Notice of Removal by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #2 Notice of Removal, (Curran, Leigh)
June 10, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay re #3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings On First Amended Complaint Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c), #2 Notice of Removal, by William J. Kambic, Jr.(Dawson, Wayne)
June 8, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Curran, Leigh)
June 4, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE for Judicial Notice of Documents In Support of Motion For Judgment on the Pleadings on First Amended Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings On First Amended Complaint Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) (Curran, Leigh)
June 4, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE For Judicial Notice Of Documents In Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings On First Amended Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings On First Amended Complaint Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) (Curran, Leigh) Modified on 6/5/2020 to indicate error. See 6/4/20 Docket Annotation (JLH, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings On First Amended Complaint Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curran, Leigh)
June 4, 2020 Docket Annotation: The parties are advised that the filing at docket #14 Notice (Other), is a duplicate filing to the one at docket #15 and should be disregarded as duplicate. The filing at docket #14 had the incorrect PDF attached and was re-filed with the correct PDF at docket #15 . (BJK, COURT STAFF)
June 3, 2020 Filing 12 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney, at docket #7 is hereby GRANTED. (CFR, Chambers Staff)
June 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Curran, Leigh)
June 3, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Curran, Leigh)
June 2, 2020 Filing 9 Unissued summons re Counterclaim Defendant Juanita M. Suarez. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 2, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE re #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leigh O. Curran, at docket #7 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 2, 2020 Summons Issued as to Counterclaim Defendant Juanita M. Suarez. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Leigh O. Curran. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2883745.) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Curran, Leigh)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 6/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling and Planning Conference Report) (CFR, Chambers Staff) (Main Document 6 replaced on 6/1/2020) (JLH, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (KMC, COURT STAFF) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/1/2020) (JLH, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/1/2020 to clarify docket text and replace with correct document (JLH, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (KMC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 6/1/2020 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against William Kambic by Wells Fargo Bank N.A..(Cruickshank, George)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2882446), filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 State Superior Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 to State Court Complaint)(Cruickshank, George)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Cover Sheet. (Cruickshank, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kambic v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Kambic
Represented By: Wayne G. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Kambic, Jr.
Represented By: Wayne G. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: George M. Cruickshank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sayer Law Group P.C.
Represented By: Darren Hojnacki
Represented By: Devoron Kathleen Hill
Represented By: Morgan Lasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: George M. Cruickshank
Represented By: Leigh O Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sayer Law Group, P.C.
Represented By: Morgan Lasley
Represented By: Darren R. Hojnacki
Represented By: Devoron Kathleen Hill
Represented By: Brian G. Sayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Juanita M. Suarez
Represented By: Darryl L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Juanita Mendiola
Represented By: Darryl L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Juanita Kambic
Represented By: Darryl L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?